NORTHAMPTON IRISH SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold community based activities including our weekly lunch club and keep fit class, monthly meals, walking group and outreach services to combat social exclusion and promote good wellbeing. We have an ongoing 'Digital Inclusion Library' tablet loan scheme. We also celebrate Irish culture in the Northamptonshire area, with our bi-annual dinner dance and 'Stories of Migration' history project.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £14,042 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick John Franks | Chair | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Houston | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Lynskey | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
David McDonnell | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN MCDONNELL | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY GANLEY | Trustee | 01 January 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.84k | £62.32k | £77.31k | £78.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.81k | £54.32k | £65.54k | £65.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £250 | £14.04k | £14.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APR 2002 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE GROUP’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE; THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG ELDERLY PERSONS IN THE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF THEIR OLD AGE, BY PROVIDING AN OUTREACH SERVICE; VISITING PEOPLE IN HOMES, OFFERING SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND BY PROVIDING EVENTS AND WEEKLY MEET-UPS WHICH INCLUDE KEEP-FIT CLASS, MONTHLY MEALS, DINNER DANCES AND OUTINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alliston Gardens Youth & Community
2 Adelaide Street
NORTHAMPTON
NN2 6AR
- Phone:
- 01604629502
- Email:
- nisg@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window