Farsi Action Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-To relieve poverty and financial hardship amongst people of Afghanistan and Farsi-speaking immigrants living in England & Wales. -To preserve Faris/Persian culture and heritage. -The advancement of Education for public benefit amongst, but not exclusively, for women/girls, in Afghanistan. - For such other charitable purposes as the Trustees may think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 24 February 2020: Standard registration
- FARSI ACTION FOUNDATION, FARSI ACTION LINE (Working name)
- TAJIK-FARSI ACTION FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karim Said LLB,MA | Chair | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Javed Qazizada BA | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Farid Farjad Dr | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.04k | £17.48k | £16.88k | £19.49k | £39.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.00k | £13.22k | £17.61k | £25.00k | £24.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 AUG 2019 as amended on 13 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE OF AFGHANISTAN AND FARSI SPEAKING IMMIGRANTS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS , LIVING IN ENGLAND & WALES, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON WELFARE AND FINANCE MATTERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A TELEPHONE HELPLINE. 2 TO PRESERVE PERSIAN/FARSI CULTURE AND HERITAGE FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT,BY CONTINUING HISTORIC TRADITIONS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, FOLK-DANCING, POETRY AND ANNUAL TRADITIONAL CELEBRATIONS, WITHIN THE PERSIAN-SPEAKING AND WIDER COMMUNITY. 3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR WOMEN/GIRLS,IN AFGHANISTAN. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO HIGH SCHOOL STUDENTS(GIRLS AND BOYS FROM DISADVANTAGED FAMILIES MAINLY IN REMOTE AND INACCESSIBLE PARTS OF AFGHANISTAN TO GET TO UNIVERSITIES THERE. 4 FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farsi Action Foundation
First Floor
Hill House
118 High Street
UXBRIDGE
Middlese
- Phone:
- 02033704315
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window