SHETLAND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RESCUE CARE AND WELFARE OF SICK, NEGLECTED OR ABANDONED HORSES AND PONIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 05 April 1984: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 May 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Pollard | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN RAFFERTY | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MCKENZIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.57k | £10.42k | £29.55k | £7.57k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.59k | £53.97k | £43.35k | £40.98k | £45.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 November 2021 | 394 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 March 2021 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF HORSES, PONIES AND IN PARTICULAR SHETLAND PONIES WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF OLD AGE, SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, NEGLECT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHETLAND RESCUE
HORSE & PONY SANCTUARY
RAMSBROOK LANE
HALE VILLAGE
LIVERPOOL
L24 5RP
- Phone:
- 01514254627
- Email:
- SHETLANDRESCUE1984@YAHOO.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window