THE CLEMENCE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Robert Edward Kerr CLEMENCE | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan Michael Offer Clemence | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
William John Clemence | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125 | £336.44k | £64.91k | £20.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £7.13k | £72.14k | £15.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 May 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 April 2023 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL OR THE ANNUAL INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITIES (BEING CHARITIES REGISTERED AS SUCH WITH THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES) OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BASSETTS
MILL LANE
HILDENBOROUGH
TONBRIDGE
TN11 9LX
- Phone:
- 01732833338
- Email:
- jclemence338@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window