Trustees NORTH YORKSHIRE EAST COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1185965

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Potts | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Perkins | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gill Edmonds | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Haiste Burns | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lane | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lindsay Mary Gee | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ellison BAHons | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA CARISS | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.