ALCESTER MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Male Voice Choir who learn music and song to enable us to sing in concerts to help raise monies for other charities. We have enjoyed singing in Italy, Spain, Austria, France, Germany and Belgium together with venues like Symphony Hall in Birmingham, St George's Chapel in Windsor and the Royal Albert Hall in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Cardiff
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Cornwall
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Northamptonshire
- Somerset
- Warwickshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 July 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW MARCUS SPEIRS | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Stuart Denby | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WALTER WOOD | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
David John Chiles | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD JOHN LEESON | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GEORGE ADAMS | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALABASTER | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALDERSON | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH LAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.60k | £1.03k | £34.28k | £22.65k | £66.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.11k | £3.32k | £30.38k | £18.78k | £68.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 7 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 6 JUNE 1984, 24 SEPTEMBER 1997 AND 22 JULY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF MALE CHORAL SINGING, THROUGH THE PERFORMANCE OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Eclipse Road
Alcester
B49 5EH
- Phone:
- 01789764120
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window