BRITISH BURN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the BBA are, for the public benefit, the relief of those suffering from burn injuries by: 1 Disseminating knowledge and stimulating prevention in the field of burns 2 Promoting education in all aspects of burn care; 3 Promoting and supporting research into scientific, clinical and societal aspects of burn injury. 4Promoting standards in the delivery of burn care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 February 2020: CIO registration
- 14 December 2020: Funds received from 260167 BRITISH BURN ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Lee | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Emily M Bridge | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Black | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sankhya Kapil Sen | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikolaos Arkoulis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ascanio Tridente | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Shepherd | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Huddleston | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brendan Sloan | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Simon Booth | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Odhran Shelley FRCS | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jayne Dudman BSc Hons | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.36k | £81.37k | £237.98k | £348.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.12k | £71.92k | £202.76k | £277.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Feb 2020 as amended on 22 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
4.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM BURN INJURIES BY: 4.1.1 DISSEMINATING KNOWLEDGE AND STIMULATING PREVENTION IN THE FIELD OF BURNS; 4.1.2 PROMOTING EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF BURN CARE; 4.1.3 PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO SCIENTIFIC, CLINICAL AND SOCIETAL ASPECTS OF BURN INJURY; 4.1.4 PROMOTING STANDARDS IN THE DELIVERY OF BURN CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal College Of Surgeons
38-43 Lincoln's Inn Fields
LONDON
WC2A 3PE
- Phone:
- 02078696923
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window