HERNE BAY FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HERNE BAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC, PERFORMANCE, LITERATURE AND THE VISUAL ARTS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF KENT, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 13 December 2019: CIO registration
- BAYFEST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RONALD DULLAGE | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Wright | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Johanne Warren | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Casey | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Garry Northwood | Trustee | 14 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | £35.00k | £25.93k | £16.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £29.76k | £25.21k | £16.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HERNE BAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC, PERFORMANCE, LITERATURE AND THE VISUAL ARTS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF KENT, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Beach House
Beach Street
Herne Bay
CT6 5PT
- Phone:
- 07568066648
- Email:
- Hernebayfestival@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window