WEST DRAYTON & YIEWSLEY SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing social and recreational activities and welfare assistance to the over 60's
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 14 January 2020: Standard registration
- 03 March 2020: Funds received from 270298 WEST DRAYTON AND YIEWSLEY SENIOR CITIZENS WELFARE ...
- WEST DRAYTON & YIEWSLEY SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norman Morrison | Chair | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Westbrook | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Peacock | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Linda Mwale | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £596 | £2.55k | £4.56k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £485 | £3.35k | £6.34k | £7.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEED OF ELDERLY PEOPLE THROUGH: 1. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE WEST DRAYTON AND YIEWSLEY AREA; WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON (THE AREA OF BENEFIT), WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE. 2. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF ELDERLY PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN OUTINGS/HOLIDAY ACTIVITIES THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. 3. TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING SERVICES TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YIEWSLEY & WEST DRAYTON COMMUNITY CENTRE
228 HARMONDSWORTH ROAD
WEST DRAYTON
MIDDLESEX
UB7 9JL
- Phone:
- 01895443423
- Email:
- office@theywd.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window