THE GEMINI OMBERSLEY COURT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
activities are focused to advance arts, culture, heritage and science by the conservation, protection and improvement of the Walled Garden and Stables at Ombersley Court. The charity will advance the education of the public in the conservation, protection and improvement of Ombersley Court in particular make available to the public information regarding the history of OC and its locality
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Simon Hopkins | Chair | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
AIMEE MYRA HOPKINS | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Edward Martin | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Coleman | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Goodman | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1304 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OMBERSLEY IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTERSHIRE (“THE PARISH”) AND THE AREAS ADJACENT THERETO AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- A) TO ADVANCE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE BY THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE WALLED GARDEN AND STABLES AT OMBERSLEY COURT AND ANY BUILDINGS OR AREAS OF LAND ATTACHED OR ANCILLARY THERETO WHICH MAY BE OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL OR CULTURAL OR ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC OR OTHER PARTICULAR INTEREST AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF OMBERSLEY COURT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND MAKE AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC INFORMATION REGARDING THE HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL OR CULTURAL OR ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC OR AGRICULTURAL OR HORTICULTURAL OR OTHER PARTICULAR INTEREST OF OMBERSLEY COURT AND ITS LOCALITY INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THE WALLED GARDEN AND STABLES AT OMBERSLEY COURT BY INTERACTING WITH THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND PROVIDING DISPLAYS OR EXHIBITIONS OR A MUSEUM OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARRISON CLARK RICKERBYS
5 DEANSWAY
WORCESTER
WR1 2JG
- Phone:
- 01562513380
- Email:
- info@geminiproperty.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window