NEWINGTON GREEN ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newington Green Alliance conducts projects and events that improve social inclusion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Islington
Governance
- 20 July 2020: CIO registration
- BridgingBeyond (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW PAKULA | Chair | 04 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Prentice | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lasandra Mundia Situmbeko | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bruna Martins Rodrigues | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Nyachieo | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shetal Sam Lakha | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Johnson | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Taryn Nanayakkara | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.82k | £13.33k | £13.35k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04k | £7.39k | £3.39k | £11.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE NEWINGTON GREEN AREA BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, BY PROVIDING PROGRAMMES, GROUPS, AND EVENTS: A. FOR INDIVIDUALS TO BUILD STRONGER AND MORE TRUSTING CONNECTIONS ACROSS BARRIERS POSED BY SOCIOECONOMIC, ETHNIC, NATIONAL ORIGIN, RELIGIOUS, ABILITY, SEX, RACIAL, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, GENDER IDENTITY, EDUCATIONAL ATTAINMENT, EMPLOYMENT, AGE, HEALTH AND LANGUAGE DIFFERENCES, AND B. FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO BECOME MORE ENGAGED IN COMMUNITY IN WAYS THAT GIVE THEM A GREATER SENSE OF BELONGING AND PURPOSE FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CHARITABLE PURPOSE: ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Andrew Pakula
Newington Green Alliance
128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07809144879
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window