Accounts and annual returns THE RIPON CITY FESTIVAL TRUST 1986

Charity number: 514981
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 June 2024 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 June 2024 140 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 February 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2021 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required