NEWLAND HOUSE SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newland House School Parents Association holds events, including fairs, quizzes, parties etc, to bring the school community together and raise funds for additional benefits for the children who attend the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 18 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Fallstrom | Chair | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maryssa Littlefair | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Carradine | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jasmine Haveland | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Sawyer | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Louise Hughes-Ward | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Cremin | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Adam Sarbicki | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mariya Yordanova Sarbicki | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Lillian Mary Jadhav | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.23k | £29.10k | £85.19k | £39.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.37k | £28.37k | £77.09k | £36.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICLUAR BY; 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newland House School
Waldegrave Park
TWICKENHAM
TW1 4TQ
- Phone:
- 02088651220
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window