STAFFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds and help organise events and activities to enhance school life for all pupils at Stafford Grammar School. Events include Christmas Fairs, Summer Fetes and concerts. Our funds are used to purchase equipment, run educational workshops, fund school trips, and support extra-curricular clubs for the benefit of pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 18 November 2019: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF SGS MUSIC (Working name)
- STAFFORD PREPARATORY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Marsh | Chair | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bennett | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Burton | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Paul Nicholas Pietrek | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marine Judson | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Thompson | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ashton | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Surjit Mahal | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Dyble | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.44k | £7.53k | £18.29k | £32.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £4.00k | £8.74k | £15.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stafford Grammar School
Burton Manor Road
STAFFORD
ST18 9AT
- Phone:
- 01785249752
- Email:
- pta@staffordgrammar.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window