Trustees STAFFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL PTA
Charity Number: 1186397

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Marsh | Chair | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Bennett | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Burton | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Paul Nicholas Pietrek | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marine Judson | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Thompson | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Ashton | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Surjit Mahal | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Dyble | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.