ORLETON & DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have a range of activities. We compete if YFC competitions that can range from ploughing to cake decorating. We also hold club meeting and usually have activities such as rounders afterwards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 October 2019: Standard registration
- ORLETON YOUNG FARMERS CLUB (Working name)
- ORLETON AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Crofts | Chair | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNABEL BEAUMONT | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Lewis | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Beaumont | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.72k | £2.61k | £16.79k | £34.45k | £20.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.84k | £1.66k | £14.62k | £29.31k | £20.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEP 1974 as amended on 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
A TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND B IN THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF SUCH MEMBERS TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS, BEING FACILITIES WHICH WILL IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SPIRITUAL AND MENTAL CAPACITIES, SELF-RELIANCE AND INDIVIDUAL RESPONSIBILITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat
Hennor House
Hennor
LEOMINSTER
HR6 0QR
- Phone:
- 07530269900
- Email:
- orletonyfc@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window