Accounts and annual returns GRASS ROOTS EDUCATIONAL ACADEMY FOR TRANSFORMATION

Charity number: 1188938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 13 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 March 2025 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 March 2025 133 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 March 2025 499 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 March 2025 499 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 June 2024 590 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 March 2025 864 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 June 2022 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1286 days