FOREVER COLOURS CHILDREN'S HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Forever Colours we keep the families at the centre of how we shape our services. We support children between the ages of 0 - 18 living with life limiting and life threatening conditions including after death care. We help support them through activities such as, Advocacy, family days, parent groups, bereavement support. We do this in the community and base our services in Buckinghamshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 28 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Bryan N Charvet | Chair | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henry Hamlin | Trustee | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrina Kaur Dhillon | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE BOWMAN | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.24k | £180.47k | £191.66k | £198.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.49k | £139.44k | £233.88k | £246.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF, TREATMENT AND CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS (AGED 0-18 YEARS) LIVING IN THE UK WITH LIFE-LIMITING AND/OR LIFE-THREATENING CONDITIONS. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A TOTAL AND ACTIVE APPROACH TO THEIR CARE FROM THE POINT OF INITIAL DIAGNOSIS, THROUGH TREATMENT, RECOVERY OR DETERIORATION AND END OF LIFE TO ENSURE THAT THEY HAVE AS FULFILLING LIVES AS POSSIBLE. THIS CARE IS PROVIDED BY: A. INVOLVING SUCH YOUNG PERSONS IN OPEN, HONEST COMMUNICATION AROUND DECISIONS ABOUT THEIR CARE. B. EMBRACING PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL ELEMENTS FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS. C. RELIEVING AND MANAGING DISTRESSING SYMPTOMS. D. ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF SHORT BREAKS AND CARE. E. ASSISTING MENTAL WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT. F. EMBRACING PLAY SCHEMES AND EVENTS FOR THE WHOLE FAMILY. 2. TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF, TREATMENT AND CARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS (AGED 0-18 YEARS) LIVING IN THE UK WITH PROFOUND AND MULTIPLE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES. THIS IS ACHIEVED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESPITE CARE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ADVICE ACHIEVING AN ACTIVE AND TOTAL APPROACH TO THEIR CARE TO ENSURE THAT THEY HAVE AS FULFILLING LIVES AS POSSIBLE. THIS RANGE OF CARE AND SUPPORT IS PROVIDED BY: A. INVOLVING SUCH YOUNG PERSONS IN OPEN, HONEST COMMUNICATION AROUND DECISIONS ABOUT THEIR CARE. B. EMBRACING PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL ELEMENTS FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG PERSONS.. C. RELIEVING AND MANAGING DISTRESSING SYMPTOMS. D. ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF SHORT BREAKS AND CARE. E. ASSISTING MENTAL WELLBEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT. F. EMBRACING PLAY SCHEMES AND EVENTS FOR THE WHOLE FAMILY. 3. TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS (AGED 0-18 YEARS) LIVING IN THE UK WITH LIFE-LIMITING AND/OR LIFE-THREATENING CONDITIONS OR PROFOUND AND MULTIPLE LEARNING DIFFICULTIES. THIS IS ACHIEVED BY: A. INVOLVING SUCH FAMILIES AND CARERS IN OPEN, HONEST COMMUNICATION AROUND DECISIONS ABOUT PROVISION OF CARE. B. EMBRACING PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL ELEMENTS FOR THE ENHANCEMENT OF PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES. C. RELIEVING AND MANAGING DISTRESSING SITUATIONS. D. ASSISTING WITH THE TEMPORARY RELIEF OF CARE RESPONSIBILITY OVER SUCH CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF SHORT BREAKS. E. RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND STRAIN ON FAMILIES BY PROVIDING ADVOCACY SUPPORT SERVICES. F. EMBRACING PLAY SCHEMES AND EVENTS FOR THE WHOLE FAMILY, SIBLINGS AND PARENTS/CARERS. 4. TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF FAMILIES WHO SUFFER BEREAVEMENT THROUGH THE LOSS OF A CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON (AGED 0-18 YEARS) WHO DIES IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AFTER-DEATH CARE SERVICES. THESE SERVICES ARE SUPPORTED BY: A. INVOLVING SUCH FAMILIES AND CARERS IN OPEN, HONEST COMMUNICATION BY RAISING AWARENESS AROUND DECISIONS ABOUT THE CHILD AND YOUNG PERSONS AFTER DEATH CARE. B. EMBRACING PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL ELEMENTS OF DEATH AND BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT. C. RELIEVING AND MANAGING GRIEF. D. ASSISTING MENTAL WELLBEING OF FAMILIES THROUGH PROVIDING THERAPEUTIC SUPPORT. E. RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND STRAIN ON FAMILIES BY PROVIDING ADVOCACY SUPPORT SERVICES. F. ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF AFTER-DEATH CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westlington Lodge
Oxford Road
Dinton
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 8TX
- Phone:
- 07969822887
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window