BUSY FINGERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1188632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Little Downham Busy Fingers Pre-School is a small pre-school in Little Downham with a maximum capacity of 30 children per day. The practice looks after children aged of 2 years 6 months to when they start reception year at school. The school have a manager a book keeper and 5 part time practitioners ranging between Level 2 and 3.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £200,341
Total expenditure: £197,877

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2020: CIO registration
  • 18 July 2024: Funds received from 308133 BUSY FINGERS PRE-SCHOOL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Imogen Ford Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Sophie Hills Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Laura Bowman Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Kendle Hanslip Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Victoria Blair Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Stephen Hazell Trustee 26 January 2024
None on record
AMANDA OGILVIE Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 24/02/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £200.34k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £197.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £161.55k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 15 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 15 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 February 2023 21 January 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 February 2023 03 June 2024 162 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Busy Fingers Pre School
Main Street
Little Downham
ELY
CB6 2ST
Phone:
01353698633