WORLD APOSTOLATE OF FATIMA (ENGLAND & WALES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the message of Our Lady of Fatima by distributing literature, newsletters and DVDs and arranging talks and visits to Cathedrals and churches; Encouraging personal and shared prayers and devotions and operating home Rosary groups; Organising an annual pilgrimage to Fatima
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Cunningham | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia D'Souza | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Kathleen Too Heng Kwee | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mari Yakeza Te | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Dixon | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mary Hayward | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donal Anthony Foley | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oonagh Mary Elizabeth Pittam | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jerlito Balagtas Paler | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Rivera | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.77k | £58.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.43k | £47.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CATHOLIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE AUTHENTIC TEACHING OF THE CATHOLIC FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR THE MESSAGE OF FATIMA, BY: * DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, NEWSLETTERS AND DVDS AND ARRANGING TALKS AND VISITS TO CATHEDRALS AND CHURCHES THAT PROMOTE THE MESSAGE OF OUR LADY OF FATIMA; * ENCOURAGING PERSONAL AND SHARED PRAYERS AND DEVOTIONS AND OPERATING HOME ROSARY GROUPS; * CO-ORDINATING THE VISITS TO CHURCHES AND CATHEDRALS OF THE STATUE OF OUR LADY AND A RANGE OF RELIGIOUS RELICS CONNECTED TO OUR LADY OF FATIMA; AND * ORGANISING AN ANNUAL PILGRIMAGE TO FATIMA. THIS MEANS BRINGING PEOPLE TO FULL CONSECRATION OF CONVERSION, DEVOTION, INTIMATE ESTEEM, REVERENCE AND LOVE. IT IS THE SPIRIT OF CONSECRATION AND CONVERSION WHERE GOD WISHES TO ESTABLISH IN THE WORLD DEVOTION TO THE IMMACULATE HEART OF MARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 BLENHEIM GARDENS
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 7BW
- Phone:
- 07786487557
- Email:
- npresident@waf-ew.org.uk
- Website:
-
worldfatima-englandwales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window