Governing document THE CHURCH REPAIR SOCIETY FOR THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN
Charity number: 514997

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1983 AS AMENDED 19 MAY 1987, 23 MARCH 1994, 10 MAY 1995, AND 24 APRIL 1996, 11 MAY 1999, 24 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCILS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITHIN THE TERRITORY OF THE SOCIETY IN THE EFFICIENT ORDERING AND FINANCING OF REPAIRS TO CHURCHES AND OTHER BUILDINGS IN THEIR CHARGE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE, LINCOLNSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.