THE FIVE TOWNS PLUS HOSPICE FUND LIMITED

Charity number: 514999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To operate the Prince of Wales Hospice, Pontefract as a centre for specialist palliative care available and accessible to all from the local community and particularly the five towns area east of Wakefield.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Wakefield

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 1984: Standard registration
  • 10 August 2022: Funds received from 1153642 THE NEW FITZWILLIAM AND KINSLEY OLD FOLKS TREAT FU...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE PRINCE OF WALES HOSPICE (Working name)
  • THE "FIVE TOWNS PLUS" HOSPICE FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GORDON TOLLEFSON Chair 07 May 1991
None on record
Abigail Alexandra Leung Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Alastair Neil Foster Lewis Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Heather Marie O'Donnell Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Simon Andrew Topham Trustee 20 October 2022
NOVA WAKEFIELD DISTRICT LIMITED
Received: On time
Stephen Dibb Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Dr PHILLIP EARNSHAW Trustee 13 August 2019
SMAWTHORNE COMMUNITY PROJECT
Received: On time
SANDRA CHESELDINE Trustee 22 October 2018
AGE UK LEEDS
Received: On time
WAKEFIELD DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Received: On time
Dr Ruth Roche Trustee 28 January 2013
None on record
BRYNTON STEWART PARKES Trustee 19 March 2002
None on record
ANN GLEED MBE Trustee 31 July 1995
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.06m £4.91m £4.62m £5.94m £4.23m
Total expenditure £4.03m £4.02m £4.12m £4.43m £4.98m
Income from government contracts N/A £138.80k £70.00k £70.00k £276.75k
Income from government grants £872.63k £1.24m £980.99k £1.36m £1.03m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.39m £1.54m £1.63m £2.61m £887.79k
Income - Other trading activities £1.65m £535.32k £1.61m £1.79m £1.83m
Income - Charitable activities £952.52k £2.07m £1.24m £1.48m £1.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.50k £8.89k £2.31k £34.63k £138.72k
Income - Other £48.88k £762.86k £136.25k £27.79k £4.37k
Income - Legacies £267.25k £590.19k £759.79k £1.80m £116.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.44m £2.49m £2.53m £2.69m £3.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.59m £1.53m £1.59m £1.74m £405.74k
Expenditure - Governance £10.89k £5.93k £5.93k £5.56k £4.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.99k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.49m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.74m £1.67m £1.55m £1.42m £1.55m
Long-term investments £25.26k £25.37k £35.46k £39.31k £569.26k
Other assets £2.76m £2.98m £3.53m £5.20m £3.96m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.19m £440.01k £368.89k £388.42k £525.27k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PRINCE OF WALES HOSPICE
HALFPENNY LANE
PONTEFRACT
WF8 4BG
Phone:
01977708868