Trustees EXMOOR ZOOLOGICAL & CONSERVATION CENTRE
Charity number: 1187438

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Todd Larsen Dalton | Chair | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Reynolds | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antony Lawrence Blackler MBE FCA | Trustee | 22 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kim Homer | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Danny Reynolds | Trustee | 30 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.