WADDESDON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1187702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The WSA supports the students and staff of Waddesdon C of E School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024

Total income: £8,123
Total expenditure: £15,390

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 2020: Standard registration
  • 23 October 2024: Funds received from 1152127 FOR WESTCOTT PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Patrick Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Claire Suzanne Wilson Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
Blaise Brogan Trustee 02 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 04/04/2023 04/04/2024
Total gross income £10.62k £5.66k £16.17k £8.12k
Total expenditure £5.15k £6.42k £1.68k £15.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2024 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2022 22 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2021 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WADDESDON C OF E SCHOOL
BAKER STREET
WADDESDON
AYLESBURY
HP18 0LQ
Phone:
01296651382
Website:

No information available