MILDRED GRAY ROBERTS WORK EXPERIENCE SUPPORT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to aid young people who are current and former attendees of Ysgol David Hughes secondary school on Ynys Mon in North Wales and those who live in the catchment area of the school but did not attend the school through: a)providing opportunities for short term work experience and placements and (b) As necessary supporting attendance at those placements through travel grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 06 December 2019: CIO registration
- MILDRED GRAY ROBERTS WESC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Roberts | Chair | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr STEPHEN MACVICAR | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
SARAH JANE MYERS | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
MENNA LYNN ROBERTS | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE CURRENT AND FORMER ATTENDEES OF YSGOL DAVID HUGHES SECONDARY SCHOOL AND THOSE WHO LIVE IN THE CATCHMENT AREA BUT DID NOT ATTEND THE SCHOOL THROUGH: A)PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR SHORT TERM WORK EXPERIENCE AND PLACEMENTS WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES, AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO CONTRIBUTE MORE FULLY TO SOCIETY AND ENHANCE THEIR OWN FUTURES; B)BY PROVIDING GRANTS FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO REQUIRE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ORDER TO ATTEND SUCH PLACEMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mildred Gray Roberts WESC
c/o 1 CASTLE STREET
BEAUMARIS
Ynys Mon
North Wales
LL58 8AP
- Phone:
- 01248811671
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window