THE JOHN ROAN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1189410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of the JRSA is to advance the education of its students by developing effective relationships between staff, parents, carers and others within the school. It will aim to achieve this by providing, facilities and equipment which support the school and help the education of the students. The JRSA does this by raising funds via social evenings, concerts, raffles, quiz nights etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £11,708
Total expenditure: £17,490

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Eve Daniels Chair 09 October 2019
None on record
Lucie Murphy Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Samantha Woodgate Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Sharleen Baxter Trustee 12 July 2023
SIR JOHN EVELYN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Ivis Williams Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
OLIVIA FRANCES GIBBS Trustee 16 February 2020
None on record
Patricia Bullen Trustee 03 December 2019
None on record
Sandra Smith Trustee 09 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £17.84k £6.04k £7.22k £11.71k
Total expenditure £2.02k £15.80k £2.42k £17.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 06 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 22 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
JOHN ROAN SCHOOL
WESTCOMBE PARK ROAD
LONDON
SE3 7QR
Phone:
02085167555