MANSFIELD WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mansfield Wildlife Rescue provides help for injured, abandoned and orphaned native wildlife with the aim to return those in care back to their natural habitat. Some examples of the wildlife we look after are badgers, foxes, hedgehogs, birds of prey, swallows etc. The areas we cover are Nottinghamshire, Derbyshire, South Yorkshire and Lincolnshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 12 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Martins | Chair | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Marie Pearson | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adele Bonsall | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashlie Jade Martins | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Light | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Wright | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £21.29k | £24.98k | £20.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.27k | £9.92k | £27.54k | £23.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £785 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF WILDLIFE IN NEED OF CARE AND MEDICAL ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MISTREATMENT. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT FOR SUCH WILDLIFE. TO EDUCATE AND PROMOTE TO THE PUBLIC THE ADVANCEMENT OF MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE PREVENTION AND CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TO WILDLIFE. TO RELEASE RECOVERED WILDLIFE BACK TO THEIR NATURAL HABITAT OR PROVIDE OTHER FACILITIES WHERE WILDLIFE CANNOT BE RELEASED. TO COVER THE AREAS OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, DERBYSHIRE, LINCOLNSHIRE AND STH YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mansfield Wildlife Rescue
Common Lane
Pleasley Vale
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG19 8FJ
- Phone:
- 01623 810625
- Email:
- mansfieldwildlife@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window