KINGSTEIGNTON COMMUNITY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1193264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We meet together for Divine Worship

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £64,109
Total expenditure: £74,541

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 January 2021: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KCBC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David Michael Goddard Chair 01 June 2010
None on record
Michael Jonathan Trigg FCA Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Michael Anthony Hayes Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Sheila Pink Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Nicholas Roger Oddy Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £75.94k £72.44k £64.11k
Total expenditure £62.31k £75.16k £74.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
30 SLANNS MEADOW
KINGSTEIGNTON
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 3GA
Phone:
01626368491
Website:

kcbchurch.org.uk