BROTHERHOOD DEFIB FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing life saving defibrillators to the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 May 2020: CIO registration
- BROTHERHOOD FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Woods | Chair | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Harrison | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Harrison | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £893 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 636 days | |
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 May 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES OF PEOPLE IN PETERBOROUGH AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING, INSTALLING, MAINTAINING AND PROMOTING AWARENESS OF PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 70 Werrington Business Park
Papyrus Road
Peterborough
PE4 5BH
- Phone:
- 07850282783
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window