SHROPSHIRE MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 515026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advance the education of the public in the art of music and the other arts, in particular by the presentation of public concerts, recitals, lectures, master classes and similar events in Shropshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £61,115
Total expenditure: £51,229

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SHREWSBURY MUSIC TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Jane Margaret Povey Chair 08 January 2025
None on record
Caroline Nowotarski Trustee 02 August 2024
None on record
Andrea P A Belloli Trustee 12 January 2024
None on record
Katharine Jane Rink Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Christine Lindsey Stephens Trustee 10 September 2019
None on record
Roger Harry Terry Trustee 11 June 2019
SHREWSBURY CANTATA CHOIR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £62.04k £22.89k £61.39k £53.93k £61.12k
Total expenditure £58.41k £12.97k £40.31k £53.88k £51.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 12 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 12 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 10 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Whitehall Street
Shrewsbury
SY2 5AD
Phone:
07377 971386