BISMILLAH UK CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's objects are for the benefit of the disadvantaged, victims of disaster by flood, cyclone and people effected by war anywhere in the world particularly people of Bangladesh who are in hardship by: Relieving poverty, sickness and distress as a result of floods, cyclones and natural calamities by providing monetary support and where necessary by providing physical support. Improving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lambeth
Governance
- 27 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Md Foysal Ahmed | Chair | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SYED ATIQUL HUSSAIN | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Abdul Salim | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SHAMSUL ISLAM | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.04k | £7.05k | £6.13k | £6.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12 | £5.02k | £4.30k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 15 March 2025 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34-36 New Park Road
LONDON
SW2 4UN
- Phone:
- 02036202702
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window