TENBURY WELLS MUSEUM AND HISTORY GROUP CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides and maintains a Museum in Tenbury to collect and display items of historic interest particularly for the local area. This includes various documents and photographs including digital copies of the Tenbury Advertiser available for research. In addition the charity organises monthly talks on historical subjects especially as related to the local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 09 December 2019: CIO registration
- 21 December 2021: Funds received from 508827 TENBURY WELLS MUSEUM & HISTORY GROUP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Franklin | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jill Malek | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Howard Malek | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Patrick | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Rees | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Monica Rees | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Morris | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.39k | £6.97k | £17.92k | £7.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.14k | £2.97k | £11.47k | £6.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £450 | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 November 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TENBURY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY: A) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MUSEUM WITHIN OR NEAR TENBURY AND TO ACQUIRE, PRESERVE, AND DISPLAY ITEMS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST RELATING TO TENBURY AND ITS ENVIRONS; (B) UNDERTAKING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF TENBURY AND ITS ENVIRONS, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (C) ASSISTING, IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES AND SOCIETIES, IN THE CONSERVATION OF TENBURY’S HISTORICAL BUILDINGS AND AMENITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tenbury Museum
Cross Street
Tenbury Wells
Worcestershire
WR15 8EF
- Phone:
- 07361 701804
- Email:
- info@tenburymuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window