HESKETH BANK CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly public religious worship services Evangelistic events Financial support to specified Christian charities Working with young people and local schools to further knowledge of the Christian Faith Support to parents/carers and their children and for those in difficulty e.g. mental health issues, suffering isolation, those requiring pastoral support, those in poverty at Christmas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 February 2020: CIO registration
- 19 May 2021: Funds received from 511881 THE HESKETH BANK CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- HBCF (Working name)
- HESKETH BANK CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jean Baxendale | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Chetwood | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Taylor | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Barrett | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Stuart Franklin Roberts | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.93k | £140.22k | £149.95k | £160.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.12k | £102.89k | £152.20k | £156.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.23k | £7.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 4.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND 4.2. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH, UNEMPLOYMENT OR SUCH OTHER ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HESKETH BANK CHRISTIAN CENTRE
MOSS LANE
HESKETH BANK
PRESTON
PR4 6AA
- Phone:
- 01772816727
- Email:
- office@hbcconline.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window