FRIENDS OF THE BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the friends is the education of the public by promoting, supporting, assisting and improving the black country living museum. The friends also provide help to the museum by volunteering to help at events within the museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 13 April 1984: Standard registration
- 03 March 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 March 2020: Funds transferred to 504481 THE BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM TRUST
- FOBCM (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE BLACK COUNTRY MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02k | £10.13k | £8.85k | £8.73k | £5.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.53k | £9.26k | £7.76k | £7.58k | £9.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 13 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 25 May 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 21 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAY 1983, AS AMENDED 8 MAY 1991 AND 10 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND INDUSTRIAL HISTORY OF THE BLACK COUNTRY BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE BLACK COUNTRY LIVING MUSEUM (REGISTERED CHARITY 504481).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window