HOPE AFTER SUICIDE LOSS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of support to adults bereaved by suicide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 December 2019: Standard registration
- 11 May 2021: Funds received from 1162622 SUICIDE BEREAVED NETWORK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth James Donaldson | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rowlands | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Katherine Coote | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dan Pennock | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Page | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Chapman | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christine Copsey | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.33k | £39.72k | £67.68k | £23.40k | £59.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.66k | £34.87k | £39.82k | £52.38k | £54.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £2.47k | £14.18k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 OCT 2018 as amended on 27 May 2021
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2. TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND SUFFERING FOR THOSE IN NEED, SPECIFICALLY PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THOSE BEREAVED BY SUICIDE BY MEANS OF: A. ONE TO ONE AND GROUP SUPPORT B. THE PROMOTION, SUSTAINING AND INCREASING OF EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE FOR PROFESSIONALS AND OTHERS WORKING IN THE FIELD OF BEREAVEMENT BY SUICIDE. C. THE DEVELOPMENT OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL SUPPORT THOSE BEREAVED BY SUICIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newman & Co
4b Church Street
DISS
IP22 4DD
- Phone:
- 07531 087623
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window