Skaters Roller Hockey Club

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Roller Hockey Training to young people in the local community .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 March 2020: Standard registration
- SKATERS RHC (Previous name)
- SKATERS RINK HOCKEY CLUB (Previous name)
- SKATERS RINK HOCKEY CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie harvey | Chair | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Edward Evison | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Fraser | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.97k | £11.96k | £20.78k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.22k | £12.29k | £15.79k | £19.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 04 MAR 2020 as amended on 25 Jan 2024 as amended on 25 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR RINK HOCKEY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
309 Norwich Road
WISBECH
Cambridgeshire
PE13 3UJ
- Phone:
- 01945882048
- Email:
- srhc.clubsecretary@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window