THE GRAY TRUST

Charity number: 1190568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide grants for charitable purposes and to provide accommodation for those in need in Sherwood House and cottages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £115,983
Total expenditure: £342,324

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 2020: CIO registration
  • 03 October 2024: Funds received from 210914 THE GRAY TRUST
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janet Diana Brothwell Trustee 12 August 2024
None on record
Ian David Griffiths Trustee 03 March 2021
PAPPLEWICK AND LINBY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS CHURCH, FARNSFIELD
Received: On time
REV CANON KEITH HOWARD TURNER Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
RICHARD JOHN PANNELL Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record
CLAIRE YVONNE MAY HARDSTAFF Trustee 27 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £123.50k £115.98k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £399.32k £342.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 04 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/o PKF SMITH COOPER
2 LACE MARKET SQUARE
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 1PB
Phone:
01159454300
Website:

No information available