DORSET INDIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to promote arts and cultural heritage of India. We achieve this by organising celebrations like Durga Puja, Saraswati Puja, Rabindra Nazrul Jayanti and other cultural programmes throughout the year. We arrange charity events and raffles to raise money and we have donated to charities like BBC Children in Need, St Mungos Bournemouth, Julias House, Bournemouth Womens Refuge and others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 16 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Amitabha Chakrabarti | Chair | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sandeep Mukherjee | Trustee | 03 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malay Chanda | Trustee | 03 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sid Ghosh | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.33k | £4.50k | £7.48k | £10.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.33k | £4.47k | £7.59k | £9.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION'S OBJECTS ARE: A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE ARTS AND CULTURAL HERITAGE OF INDIA. B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. C) TO FURTHER SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
271 SANDBANKS ROAD
LILLIPUT
POOLE
271 Sandbanks Road
POOLE
BH14 8EY
- Phone:
- 07766006825
- Email:
- amitc99@yahoo.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window