AUTISM CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity include providing clinical and social care services for autistic people and advancing education, training or employment opportunities in the field of autism research. The activities further include the encouragement, support and promotion of research into autism and related subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 2020: Standard registration
- 12 October 2023: Funds received from 1136737 AUTISM RESEARCH TRUST
- AUTISM ACTION (Working name)
- ACE (Previous name)
- AUTISM CENTRE FOR EXCELLENCE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fraser Hardie | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jason Atta Kwei Arday | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA HELENA PENROSE BUCKLEY | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elias Sakellis | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Maria Lewy | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Buisson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Baron-Cohen | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Norah Binks | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LEWIS OWENS | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Vyvyan Pocock | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Sebastian Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Leslie Tobin | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07m | £911.18k | £886.13k | £414.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.34k | £579.51k | £809.75k | £1.49m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.07m | £897.74k | £855.51k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £30.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £13.44k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £34.34k | £579.51k | £809.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £447 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.85k | £5.49k | £6.63k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £333.33k | £385.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 JAN 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 OCT 2020 as amended on 10 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL BEING, AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AUTISTIC PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES BY: 2.1 PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CLINICAL AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES FOR AUTISTIC PEOPLE OR PEOPLE WITH ASSOCIATED COMMUNICATION, SOCIAL OR BEHAVIOURAL CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES; 2.2 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION, TRAINING OR EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR SUCH PEOPLE AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF OTHERS IN AUTISM, ASSOCIATED COMMUNICATION, SOCIAL OR BEHAVIOURAL CONDITIONS; AND 2.3 THE ENCOURAGEMENT, SUPPORT AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO AUTISM AND RELATED SUBJECTS (AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH), IN PARTICULAR WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING NEW AND VALIDATED METHODS FOR ASSESSMENT, INTERVENTION AND TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DOUGLAS HOUSE
18B TRUMPINGTON ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 8AH
- Phone:
- 01223603146
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window