Trustees AUTISM CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE
Charity number: 1191599

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fraser Hardie | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jason Atta Kwei Arday | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA HELENA PENROSE BUCKLEY | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elias Sakellis | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Maria Lewy | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Buisson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Baron-Cohen | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Norah Binks | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr LEWIS OWENS | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Iain Vyvyan Pocock | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Sebastian Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Leslie Tobin | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.