CLAY HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Clay Hill Community Association manages the Riverside Community Centre at Rosemoor Gardens, Newbury, and uses it as a base for its activities such as school holiday clubs and free food distribution. We make halls available to hire for private events, and support many local organisations that use our halls and rooms for purposes that benefit the whole local community and the natural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £256 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 29 October 2019: CIO registration
- CHCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAROLD GRAHAME FARQUHAR | Chair | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
LINDA LOUISE JOYCE BOOKER | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN LUSBY TAYLOR | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.59k | £13.65k | £21.22k | £30.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.54k | £7.85k | £13.20k | £5.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.18k | N/A | N/A | £256 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- (I)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF AND THOSE WORKING IN OR VISITING THE WEST BERKSHIRE DISTRICT COUNCIL WARD OF NEWBURY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; AND (II)TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE') AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME(WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR PERSON OR BODY)IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C H C A
RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY CENTRE
ROSEMOOR GARDENS
NEWBURY
- Phone:
- 0163533078
- Email:
- chcaRiverside@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window