CHATTERBOX PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are Chatterbox Pre School on a military base in Wiltshire We are open to Military personal children and offer places outside the camp to local children. We hold cake stalls to raise money to buy childens equipment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 24 March 2020: CIO registration
- 28 May 2020: Funds received from 1065539 CHATTERBOX PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Claire Oldfield | Chair | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Selina Taylor | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Morton | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BAWCUTT | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.97k | £59.57k | £37.10k | £53.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.29k | £98.40k | £51.80k | £54.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 March 2025 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 April 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH PROVISION OF A PRE-SCHOOL IN TRENCHARD LINES, UPAVON, BY OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY AND LEARNING FACILITIES THAT MEET THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN IN THE LOCAL AREA REGARDLESS OF FAMILY STATUS, GENDER, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, CULTURE, RELIGION OR BELIEF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHATTERBOX PRE-SCHOOL
Trenchard lines
UPAVON STATION
PEWSEY
SN9 6BE
- Phone:
- 01980615275
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window