Accounts and annual returns PONTEFRACT MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity Number: 515051
Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 24 days
Annual return 01 July 2023 16 August 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2022 21 June 2023 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2020 14 March 2022 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not Required