FABIAN'S CHILDHOOD CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in London and Surrey raising funds to provide treats children and the families of children undergoing cancer treatment at the hospitals and hospices in the locality
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 02 October 2020: Standard registration
- THE FABIAN BATE MEMORIAL TRUST FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANK WATSON | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Watson Ms | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Watson | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158 | £2.12k | £1.60k | £2.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £846 | £2.13k | £1.78k | £3.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 June 2024 | 298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN UNDERGOING CANCER TREATMENT AND THEIR FAMILIES, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE ROYAL MARDEN HOSPITAL IN SUTTON THROUGH: (A)PROVIDING FUNDING FOR DAY TRIPS AND ACTIVITIES; (B)PROVIDING FREE HAND AND FINGERPRINT JEWELLERY FOR BEREAVED PARENTS; (C)PROVIDING ITEMS, SEASONAL GIFTS TO CHILDREN AND ESSENTIAL OVERNIGHT TREAT BAGS TO PARENTS. 2.TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH CHILDHOOD ACUTE LYMPHOBLASTIC LEUKAEMIA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPECIFIC MEDICAL EQUIPMENT TO THE NORTHERN INSTITUTE FOR CANCER RESEARCH TO ASSIST WITH SPEEDING UP THE DIAGNOSIS OF CHILDREN WITH ACUTE LYMPHOBLASTIC LEUKAEMIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 EMBER FARM AVENUE
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 0BJ
- Phone:
- 07931449467
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window