INTERWOVEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities in furtherance of our charitable objects include: - Provision of a place of worship - Education in the Christian religion - Community pastoral work and charitable giving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL KENNETH RICHARDSON | Chair | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Michael Winter | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEREK BUCKLEY | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Hayhurst | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.08k | £19.95k | £20.92k | £15.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.77k | £12.82k | £13.14k | £11.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 May 2020
Charitable objects
“TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF VALUES ATTACHED IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME. ACTIVITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS WILL INCLUDE: · PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP; ·EDUCATION IN THE RELIGION; ·COMMUNITY PASTORAL WORK AND CHARITABLE GIVING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Aspels Crescent
Penwortham
PRESTON
PR1 9AN
- Phone:
- 07710582758
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window