ADVOCACY IN GREENWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people with learning disabilities by: Providing a range of independent advocacy services Improving quality of life Enabling people to assert their rights and make decisions about their future Develop and deliver accessible training. Work strategically to influence policy and practice Greenwich and surrounding areas also specific projects and services across London and wider.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,984 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 29 November 2019: Standard registration
- 07 July 2021: Funds received from 1009787 ADVOCACY IN GREENWICH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Chan | Chair | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Bolton | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abdul Hameed | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eveline Peates | Trustee | 15 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £245.37k | £299.05k | £222.12k | £185.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.21k | £226.76k | £221.46k | £208.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.67k | £45.74k | £19.78k | £35.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT DISABLED PEOPLE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH A FOCUS ON PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES BY: A) PROVIDING THEM WITH A RANGE OF INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY SERVICES, IMPROVING QUALITY OF LIFE AND ENABLING PEOPLE TO ASSERT THEIR RIGHTS. B) SUPPORTING PEOPLE WHO ARE VULNERABLE OR AT A SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE TO MAKE DECISIONS ABOUT THEIR FUTURE. C) SUPPORTING PEOPLE WHO ARE MARGINALISED TO DEVELOP A RANGE OF SKILLS. D) DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING ACCESSIBLE TRAINING ALONGSIDE OUR BENEFICIARIES. E) TO WORK STRATEGICALLY TO INFLUENCE POLICY AND PRACTICE IN ADVOCACY ALONGSIDE AND ON BEHALF OF DISABLED PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor Equitable House
7 General Gordon Square
LONDON
SE18 6FH
- Phone:
- 02082933720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window