SAVILE TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to advance the physical education of boys and girls up to the age of 18 primarily resident Savile Town and the surrounding area by providing facilities and coaching for football ensuring that due attention is given to their physical, personal and educational development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 18 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imtiaz Ameen | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harunrashid Adam | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Najam Sheikh | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.27k | £20.64k | £21.32k | £18.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.84k | £13.87k | £27.37k | £22.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 31 October 2024 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 October 2024 | 489 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 October 2024 | 489 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 138 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS UP TO 18 YEARS OF AGE RESIDENT IN SAVILE TOWN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR FOOTBALL ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THEIR PHYSICAL, PERSONAL AND EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS.
Area of benefit
SAVILE TOWN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 HEADFIELD ROAD
DEWSBURY
WF12 9JF
- Phone:
- 07968084485
- Email:
- imtiazameen@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window