READ EASY BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of adults in the Bristol area, in literacy. We work on a 1:1 basis, with the Coach/Reader pair meeting twice each week. All Coaches are volunteers and are trained in the phonics method. All reading materials are provided for the Reader, at no cost to him/her. There is no time limit within which the Reader has to achieve a certain standard of literacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 November 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Graham Bottrill | Chair | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Pedoussaut | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Meg Wilson | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gamage | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Peter Latus | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexis Channon | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jefferies | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jan Armstrong | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Johnston | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frederica Newbery | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.57k | £6.90k | £1.02k | £1.14k | £3.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £2.11k | £4.56k | £3.58k | £3.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE ADULT PUBLIC WITHIN THE BRISTOL AREA IN LITERACY
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 BELLE VUE ROAD, EASTON
BRISTOL
37 Belle Vue Road
Easton
BRISTOL
BS5 6DR
- Phone:
- +441179655883
- Email:
- Bristol@readeasy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window