BREAD OF LIFE OUTREACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving the homeless and vulnerably housed in Exeter and the surrounding area. Providing food, essentials for life on the streets, social, emotional and spiritual support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 21 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Reah | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Clist | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.66k | £28.50k | £14.33k | £12.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £19.55k | £16.17k | £12.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.76k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 September 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APR 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF INDIVIDUALS IN NEED, IN EXETER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING, AND SUCH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. THE CHARITY ACTS WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS AND GOES OUT IN THE NAME OF JESUS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Tedders Close
Hemyock
CULLOMPTON
Devon
EX15 3XD
- Phone:
- 07709282519
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window