PENSBY WOOD PARENTS AND CARERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide educational and recreational activities to proufoundly disabled adults and the wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 16 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wirral
Governance
- 13 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Anthony Williams | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Conrad Toohey | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Lilian King | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Barbara Tipping | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 16/10/2020 | 16/10/2021 | 16/10/2022 | 16/10/2023 | 16/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.64k | £21.97k | £23.41k | £23.41k | £3.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £50 | £50 | £50 | £23.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 16 October 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 October 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 16 October 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 16 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED ON 22 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED ADULTS, THEIR PARENTS AND CARERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1.PROVIDING AND SUPPORTING SERVICES, FACILITIES AND EDUCATION AT PENSBY WOOD DAY CENTRE 2.RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF LIVING WITH DISABILITIES 3.WORKING TO PROMOTE INCLUSION AND REDUCE ISOLATION AND LONELINESS
Contact information
- Address:
-
50A SOMERSET ROAD
PENSBY
WIRRAL
CH61 8SW
- Phone:
- 01516487313
- Email:
- info@wirralevolutions.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window